Vice, Frances Barbro (CPSO#: 76570)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 02 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Mar 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2003 to 31 Mar 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jul 2007