Vicente, Lorena Claudia (CPSO#: 29120)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients that saw Dr. Vicente at the Women's Health in Women's Hands Community Health Centre should contact the Centre to request copies of the records.
Date Received: 02 May 2013

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013