Vickar, Darby Kelly (CPSO#: 52094)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trilliumhealthpartners
Mississauga Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7524
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Magnuson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 17 2017


Corporation Name: Darby Kelly Vickar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Vickar ( CPSO# 52094 )

Business Address:
Trillium Helath Partners
Mississauga Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7524

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 12 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARBY KELLY VICKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VICKAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1986