Victor, Gary Howard (CPSO#: 52185)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Perley And Rideau Veterans
Health Centre
1750 Russell Rd
Ottawa ON  K1G 5Z6
Phone: (613) 526-7170 Ext. 2336
Fax: (613) 738-5328
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

60 Cambridge St. N
Ottawa ON  K1R 7A5
Canada
Phone: (613) 562-6262
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gary Victor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Victor ( CPSO# 52185 )

Business Address:
The Perly and Rideau Veterans' Health Centre
1750 Russell Road
Ottawa ON  K1G 5Z6
Phone Number: (613) 526-7170

Business Address:
60 Cambridge Street North
Ottawa ON  K1R 7A5
Phone Number: (613) 502-6262

Business Address:
2865 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1V 8N5
Phone Number: (613) 731-4660

Business Address:
10 Nadolny Sachs Private
Ottawa ON  K2A 4G7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 27 Nov 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GARY HOWARD VICTOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VICTOR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1985