Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Videtic, Gregory Martin (CPSO#: 63964)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 May 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 May 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:McGill University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept. of Radiation Oncology/CA50
Cleveland Clinic
9500 Euclid Avenue
Cleveland OH  44195
United States
Phone: (216) 444-9797
Fax: (216) 445-1068

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Indiana
USA - Massachusetts
USA - Ohio

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY MARTIN VIDETIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIDETIC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 1994