Vidins, Eva Ilze (CPSO#: 20770)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Latvian

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004