Vidyasankar, Gokul (CPSO#: 94921)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 17 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 22 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Apr 2011 to 29 Apr 2011
Elective Trainee - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 02 Aug 2011 to 26 Aug 2011
Elective Trainee - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 17 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 18 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 17 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Aug 2014