Vieira, Amanda Marie (CPSO#: 97940)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
L H S C Children's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
800 Commissioner's Road East
London ON  N6C 2V5
Phone: (519) 685-8346
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 24 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMANDA MARIE VIEIRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIEIRA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 25 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 28 Feb 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2017 to 26 May 2017
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2017