Vieira, Rose-Anne Patricia (CPSO#: 67041)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHO Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 3931
Fax: (905) 7214764
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rose-Anne Vieira Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 20 2016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROSE-ANNE PATRICIA VIEIRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIEIRA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Apr 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 May 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 May 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996