Vigneault, Maurice (CPSO#: 22664)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 02 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 15 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1970
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Nov 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2001
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002