Vigneron, Eugene Anthony (CPSO#: 65407)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Carleton Family Health Team
Box 218
119 Langstaff Drive
Carp ON  K0A 1L0
Phone: (613) 839-3271
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EUGENE ANTHONY VIGNERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIGNERON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2008