Vignjevic, Peter Michael (CPSO#: 66699)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bosnian, Croatian, English, Serbian, Ukrainian, Yugoslav

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
800 Queenston Road
Hamilton ON  L8G 1A7
Phone: (905) 549-1025
Fax: (905) 549-9487
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter M. Vignjevic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Vignjevic ( CPSO# 66699 )

Business Address:
Suite 305
800 Queenston Road
Hamilton ON  L8G 1A7
Phone Number: (905) 549-7873

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER MICHAEL VIGNJEVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIGNJEVIC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997