Viguera Salazar, Milagro Caridad (CPSO#: 87270)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Apr 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Apr 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Inst.Sup.Ciencias de Med.de Stgo.de Cuba, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P O Box 520
280 Main Street
Lucan ON  N0M 2J0
Phone: (519) 227-0909
Fax: (519) 227-0740
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

280 Main Street
Lucan ON  N0M 2J0
Canada
Phone: 519-227-0909
Fax: 519-227-0740
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Milagro Viguera Salazar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Viguera Salazar ( CPSO# 87270 )

Business Address:
Lucan Medical Centre
280 Main Street
Box 520
Lucan ON  N0M 2J0
Phone Number: (519) 227-4015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MILAGRO CARIDAD VIGUERA SALAZAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIGUERA SALAZAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2007 to 23 Jan 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Jan 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2008 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2009 to 30 Apr 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2011