Vijay, Nishka Raghavan (CPSO#: 76378)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Staff Psychiatrist
Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone: (613) 732-2811
Fax: (613) 732-6350
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nishka Vijay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Vijay ( CPSO# 76378 )

Business Address:
Pembroke Regional Hospital
324 - 705 Mackay Street
Tower C
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone Number: (613) 732-2811

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NISHKA RAGHAVAN VIJAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIJAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006