Vijayaraghavan, Ram (CPSO#: 73907)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Heart Health Institute
Unit 412
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone: (416) 281-9499
Fax: (416) 283-5705
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

235 Salem Road
Second Floor
Ajax ON  L1Z 0B1
Canada
Phone: 905-426-8333
Fax: 905-426-4447
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

2391 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1K 2M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 750-9000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ram Vijayaraghavan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Weir ( CPSO# 75049 )
Dr. R. Vijayaraghavan ( CPSO# 73907 )

Business Address:
Suite E-5
235 Salem Road
Ajax ON  L1Z 0B1
Phone Number: (905) 426-8333

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Cardiology
412 - 1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone Number: (416) 281-9499

Business Address:
2391 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1K 2M5

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 5E9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 01 Oct 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAM VIJAYARAGHAVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIJAYARAGHAVAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003