Vijh, Meeta (CPSO#: 69977)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Oct 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Oct 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Gulbarga University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McLaughlin Village Medical Clinic
2nd Floor
85 Steeles Avenue West
Brampton ON  L6Y 0K3
Phone: (905) 455-9374
Fax: (905) 455-9505
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Oct 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEETA VIJH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIJH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Sep 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 1998