Vilis, Donna Mary (CPSO#: 29546)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Aug 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Box 160
Pakenham ON  K0A 2X0
Phone: (613) 624-5480
Fax: (613) 624-5223
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vilis Kiskis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Vilis ( CPSO# 29546 )
Dr. J. Kiskis ( CPSO# 24712 )

Business Address:
P.O. Box 160
106 Renfrew Street
Pakenham ON  K0A 2X0
Phone Number: (613) 624-5480

Business Address:
350 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Phone Number: (613) 623-3166

Business Address:
275 Ida Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 3M7
Phone Number: (613) 623-6547

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONNA MARY VILIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VILIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1977