Villa Restrepo, Diego (CPSO#: 85519)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Pontificia Universidad Javeriana, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Sep 2010
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jan 2011