Villanueva Arquint, Monique (CPSO#: 65322)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: Arquint, Monique (used until: 17 Nov 2003 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
P O Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7044
Fax: (905) 472-7591
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONIQUE VILLANUEVA ARQUINT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VILLANUEVA ARQUINT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1993