Villarreal-Careaga, Jorge (CPSO#: 69702)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universidad La Salle Escuela, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Dec 1995 to 30 Nov 1996
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Dec 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Nov 1997
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Dec 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Nov 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Nov 1997
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998