Villemaire, Ronald James (CPSO#: 32450)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Jul 1997

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1994
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jul 1997

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Aug 1994
Summary:

 In a Hearing which began in February 1994, Dr. Villemaire pleaded guilty to a charge of 
 professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that 
 he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.  The Discipline Committee 
 accepted this plea, and found Dr. Villemaire guilty of professional misconduct.  Consequently, the 
 Committee ordered that Dr. Villemaire be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be 
 recorded on the Register.  It further ruled that a restriction be placed on his licence to 
 practice, such that he be prohibited from practicing clinical medicine in Ontario, in either an 
 office setting or an emegency room setting, until (a) such time as he had been assessed, at his 
 own expense, by the Physician Review Program at McMaster University in the areas of both family 
 medicine and emergency medicine; and (b) he had achieved a competence rating of at least Level 2 
 in the relevant areas and completed any remediation as prescribed, to the satisfaction of the 
 Registrar.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Feb 17, 1994