Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Villeneuve, Edith (CPSO#: 61836)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Sep 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Oct 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Sep 1991