Vincent, Eleanore Lynette (CPSO#: 60144)

Current Status: Suspended as of 26 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1988

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1988
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 15 Nov 2007
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 26 Aug 2009
Suspension of registration imposed: Fitness to Practise Committee Effective: 26 Aug 2009

Practice Restrictions

Registration Status: Suspended     Effective From: 26 Aug 2009


Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Executive Committee Effective: 15 Nov 2007 Active

Previous Hearings

Committee: Fitness To Practise
Decision Date: 26 Aug 2009
Summary:

 On August 26, 2009, the Fitness to Practise Committee found that Dr. Vincent is incapacitated, as 
 defined in s. 1(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code. 

The Committee directed the 
 Registrar to suspend Dr. Vincent's certificate of registration on an indefinite basis, with the 
 proviso that she may apply for reinstatement, with supporting evidence, if in the future she 
 wishes to do so.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 26 Aug 2009


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 06 Mar 1995
Summary:

 In March 1995, Dr. Vincent pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 
 29(33) of Ontario Regulation 548/90, as amended, in that she engaged in conduct or an act relevant 
 to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be 
 regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  The Discipline Committee 
 accepted this plea, and found Dr. Vincent guilty of professional misconduct.  Consequently, the 
 Committee ordered that Dr. Vincent be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded 
 on the Register.  The Committee also ruled that the Doctor be fined the sum of $2000.00, to be 
 paid within sixty days of this Order becoming final.  If the fine were not paid within the 
 stipulated time-limit, Dr. Vincent's licence to practice was to be suspended for a period of sixty 
 days.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Mar 06, 1995