Vincent, George Manuel Ferreira (CPSO#: 52561)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
234-Sunnyside Wing West
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6773
Fax: (416) 530-6184
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George M. Vincent Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Vincent ( CPSO# 54574 )
Dr. G. Vincent ( CPSO# 52561 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Suite 234
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M5R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6773

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE MANUEL FERREIRA VINCENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VINCENT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Sep 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1991