Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Vincent, Lisa Gaye (CPSO#: 62481)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Dec 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MCI The Doctor's Office
2575 Dundas Street West, Unit #15
Mississauga ON  L5K 2M6
Phone: (905) 820-3310
Fax: (905) 820-3312
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lisa G. Vincent Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Vincent ( CPSO# 62481 )

Business Address:
MCI The Doctor's Office
2575 Dundas Street West
Suite 15
Mississauga ON  L5K 2M6
Phone Number: (905) 820-3310

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA GAYE VINCENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VINCENT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1991