Vincent, Mark David (CPSO#: 57969)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Aug 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Regional Cancer Program
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone: (519) 685-8634
Fax: (519) 685-8624
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark D. Vincent Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Vincent ( CPSO# 57969 )

Business Address:
London Regional Cancer Program
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone Number: (519) 685-8640

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 02 Sep 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK DAVID VINCENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VINCENT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 1987
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Apr 1987
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Mar 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1991
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1992