Vincent, Merville Arthur (CPSO#: 54674)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Jun 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jun 1995