Vincic, Lydia Mirjana (CPSO#: 54441)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Pathology
The Brantford General
200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: 519-751-5544
Fax: 519-752-7809
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Catharines General
1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: 905-684-7271 Ext. 46226
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 01 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LYDIA MIRJANA VINCIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VINCIC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1985