Vinden, Christopher Martyn (CPSO#: 55681)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6C 2V1
Phone: (519) 685-8407
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. A. Scott Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Vinden ( CPSO# 55681 )
Dr. L. Scott ( CPSO# 51682 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital Western Ontario
800 Commissioner Road East
London ON  N6C 2V1
Phone Number: (519) 685-8571


Corporation Name: C. M. Vinden Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Vinden ( CPSO# 55681 )
Dr. L. Scott ( CPSO# 51682 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6C 2V1
Phone Number: (519) 685-8407

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 12 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER MARTYN VINDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VINDEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1988