Vinegar, David Alan (CPSO#: 27885)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Written requests for medical records should be sent to: Suite 435 5 - 190 Minets Point Road Barrie, ON L4N 8J8
Date Received: 11 Jan 2008

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 May 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jan 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jun 2010