Vinette-Azzi, Julie France (CPSO#: 75257)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: Vinette, Julie France (used until: 23 Jun 2002 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
unit 101
879 Shefford Rd
Ottawa ON  K1J 8H9
Phone: (613) 742-7907
Fax: (613) 216-9030
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE FRANCE VINETTE-AZZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VINETTE-AZZI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2002