Vinuela, Fernando Vidal (CPSO#: 31300)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 May 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of the Republic, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 15 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1974 to 30 Jun 1975
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1980
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 22 Oct 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 May 2006