Viola, Raymond Anthony (CPSO#: 33218)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 May 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 May 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
34 Barrie Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3J7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 3223
Fax: (613) 548-2436
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kingston Health Sciences Centre
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Canada
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 3223
Fax: (613) 548-2436
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Raymond Viola Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Viola ( CPSO# 33218 )

Business Address:
34 Barrie Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3J7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAYMOND ANTHONY VIOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIOLA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 1982