Vira, Tasnim (CPSO#: 87070)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Rapid Cardiology Assessment clinic
A216-2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 2484
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

115 Midair Court
Brampton ON  L6T 5M3
Canada
Phone: 877-718-2196
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

4076-3080 Yonge St
North York ON  M4N 3N1
Canada
Phone: 647-347-6644
Fax: 647-347-6647
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

103-1615 Dufferin St
Toronto ON  M6H 4H4
Canada
Phone: 647-477-2294
Fax: 416-654-4505
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

491 Lawrence Ave W, 5th floor
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Canada
Phone: (416) 781-9500
Fax: (416) 781-7985
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1590 Yonge St, Suite 301
Toronto ON  M4T 1Z8
Canada
Phone: (416) 927-8888
Fax: (416) 927-1898
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tasnim Vira Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Vira ( CPSO# 87070 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Echocardiology Lab
A216 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
Suite 4076
3080 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4N 3N1

Business Address:
Suite 301
1590 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 1Z8

Business Address:
202 - 3101 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M8X 2W2

Business Address:
115 Midair Court
Brampton ON  L6T 5M3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 03 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TASNIM VIRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIRA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Sep 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2014