Virani, Mirza Rajabali (CPSO#: 52332)

Current Status: Suspended as of 01 Sep 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Sep 1987

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Persian, Swahili

Education:Pahlavi University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Virani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 4 2012


Corporation Name: Mirza Virani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Virani ( CPSO# 52332 )

Business Address:
Suite 112
7155 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Phone Number: (905) 470-7999

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 1983
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Sep 1987
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 03 Sep 1987
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 21 Sep 2016
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 21 Sep 2016
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 28 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 28 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Sep 2017
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Sep 2017

Practice Restrictions

Registration Status: Suspended     Effective From: 01 Sep 2017


Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Sep 2017 Active

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 20 Jun 2016
Summary:

On June 20, 2016, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
Ontario found that Dr. Mirza Rajabali Virani committed an act of professional misconduct in that 
he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all of 
the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
unprofessional. 
 
Dr. Mirza Rajabali Virani, a family physician who obtained his medical degree in Iran, had a 
company called MRV International with an account at the Royal Bank of Canada.  
 
In 2006, Mr. Arshad Latif, a purported businessman from Pakistan, proposed an investment 
opportunity to Dr. Virani. Within a week or two of investing $25,000.00, Dr. Virani lost all the 
money he had invested with Mr. Latif. 
 
PATIENT A 
 
Patient A, who is originally from Iran, was Dr. Virani’s patient between about 1989 and 2011. 
One of the reasons he chose Dr. Virani as his physician was because Dr. Virani speaks Farsi. 
Patient A has referred relatives as well as other members of the Iranian-Canadian community as 
patients to Dr. Virani’s practice over the years. 
 
Patient A considered Dr. Virani to be successful, trustworthy, and wealthy, as well as a respected 
member of the community.  
 
Patient A had told Dr. Virani during medical appointments that he had a successful business and 
a line of credit and was building a new home for his family. Dr. Virani suggested they become 
business partners and made requests for money. Patient A’s lawyer advised that Patient A should 
obtain collateral; however  
 
Patient A trusted Dr. Virani and did not obtain collateral or enter into written agreements with 
Dr. Virani regarding the loans he made to him. 
 
In August 2006, Dr. Virani telephoned Patient A while he was abroad and told him that he 
needed $60,000.00 right away.  
 
Patient A told his wife to obtain a bank draft payable to Dr. Virani out of Patient A's line of 
credit, which she delivered to Dr. Virani on August 30, 2006. 
 
Dr. Virani introduced Patient A to Mr. Latif in September 2006. Dr. Virani did not inform 
Patient A that he had lost $25,000.00 in an earlier deal with Mr. Latif.  
 
Mr. Latif told Patient A that if he were to invest $448,000.00, he would make a $33,000.00 profit 
in one month. A few weeks later, Mr. Latif proposed another business investment to Dr. Virani 
to try and recoup the losses from the previous failed investment.  
 
Although uninterested in the investment, Patient A agreed to loan $448,000.00 to Dr. Virani. Dr. 
Virani was aware that the money was borrowed from Patient A's line of credit. Dr. Virani agreed 
to pay the interest on the line of credit. Ultimately, Dr. Virani paid only four interest installments 
on the line of credit, totaling $15,134.82. 
 
On October 16, 2006, Patient A went to the Royal Bank of Canada with Dr. Virani and Mr. Latif 
and provided a $448,000.00 draft to MRV International. Next, Dr. Virani wrote a $448,000.00 
cheque to Mr. Latif’s company from the MRV account. 
 
RBC informed Dr. Virani that it would not deal with the Pakistani bank because RBC viewed it 
as a dubious transaction. Dr. Virani did not pass this information along to Patient A. 
Months elapsed, and Dr. Virani provided various reasons for not repaying Patient A’s loan. 
 
In February 2007, Dr. Virani promised to pay back the original $60,000.00 plus the subsequent 
$448,000.00 if Patient A loaned him a further $53,410.00. Dr. Virani told Patient A that he 
needed this new loan to have a shipment of plastic goods released, which he claimed was worth 
$629,000.00. Patient A loaned him another $53,410.00 on February 16, 2007. 
 
On the same date, Dr. Virani provided Patient A with cheques in the amounts of $448,000.00, 
$33,000.00 and $53,410.00. Patient A, when attempting to cash the cheques, was told by the 
bank that Dr. Virani had put stop payments on the cheques on the same day they were written. 
 
On April 15, 2007, Dr. Virani provided a cheque in the amount of $53,410.00 that Patient A was 
able to cash. 
 
Patient A contemplated legal action against Dr. Virani but did not pursue an action on the belief 
that he would not get any money back. 
 
Patient A and his family continued to see Dr. Virani as their physician in the hope that Dr. Virani 
would eventually pay the money back. 
 
Dr. Virani repaid Patient A $128,544.82 prior to the bankruptcy proposal, including the freight 
charge reimbursement of $53,410.00, interest payments of $15,134.82, and reimbursement of the 
$60,000 loaned in August 2006. 
 
 
PATIENT B 
 
Dr. Virani also borrowed funds from another patient, Patient B, in relation to Mr. Latif's 
investment proposals. He also introduced the second patient to Mr. Latif. Dr. Virani did not 
inform the second patient about the initial failed investment with Mr. Latif in which Dr. Virani 
lost $25,000.00. 
 
Patient B, who is also originally from Iran, was Dr. Virani’s patient between about 1990 and 
2007. Patient B trusted Dr. Virani and eventually several members of Patient B’s family became 
Dr. Virani’s patients as well. 
 
Patient B and Patient A did not know one another and also did not know that Dr. Virani had 
another patient lending him funds.  
 
Dr. Virani became aware of Patient B’s business affairs and financial success over the years. 
Patient B felt comfortable with Dr. Virani, sharing details of his business as well as the fact that 
he had a substantial line of credit available for his business. 
 
In September 2006, Dr. Virani introduced Mr. Latif to Patient B. Dr. Virani told Patient B about 
an investment opportunity that he wanted to discuss with Patient B. Patient B told Dr. Virani that 
he was not interested in the investment, and indicated that, due to the nature of his business, he 
did not trust anybody.  
 
Dr. Virani asked Patient B if he trusted him. Patient B replied that he trusted Dr. Virani "one 
hundred percent." He agreed to lend money to Dr. Virani and to use his line of credit to do so. 
Dr. Virani offered to pay interest on the loan. Patient B refused, as his religious beliefs do not 
permit interest payments. 
 
Patient B loaned Dr. Virani $150,000.00 from his line of credit, which Dr. Virani immediately 
wired to Mr. Latif's company, Pakistan Trading Co. Dr. Virani agreed to repay the loan within 
one month. 
 
On November 10, 2006, Dr. Virani again approached Patient B and asked for another 
$51,000.00. Patient B agreed, obtaining the money from his line of credit. At Patient B's request, 
Dr. Virani wrote out a promissory note on his prescription pad for the total loan of $201,000.00, 
undertaking in that note to return the amount unconditionally within three months, which would 
have been February 10,2007. 
 
In February 2007, Patient B attempted to collect the money owing. Dr. Virani told Patient B he 
was not able to repay the loan. Dr. Virani told Patient B that he needed more money to pay taxes 
and duties on a shipment of goods, without which he would be unable to repay any part of the 
loan already made. However, if Patient B were to give Dr. Virani some more money, Dr. Virani 
would be able to repay everything immediately. 
 
On the basis of Dr. Virani's representations, Patient B loaned him another $34,633.00 on 
February 9, 2007. On the same date, at Patient B's request, Dr. Virani wrote three undated 
cheques, representing the total amount of all three loans, namely; $235,633.00. 
 
Dr. Virani told Patient B that he would be able to pay him within a few days and would tell 
Patient B what dates to put on the cheques. Dr. Virani never provided this information to Patient 
B and did not repay the loans. 
 
Patient B subsequently took legal action against Dr. Virani and obtained judgment in the amount 
of $235,633.00 from the Superior Court of Justice. Patient B has never collected on that 
judgment. 
 
BANKRUPTCY 
 
On June 30, 2011, Dr. Virani made a bankruptcy proposal. Both Patient A and Patient B are 
listed as unsecured creditors.  
 
By the time the proposal expires, Patient A, who is listed as a creditor in the amount of 
$448,000.00, will have received total payments of approximately $42,000.00. Patient B, who is 
listed as a creditor in the amount of $289,096.00, will have received total payments of 
approximately $27,000.00. 
 
PENALTY 
 
On September 21, 2016, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
   -  The Registrar suspend Dr. Virani’s certificate of registration for an eight (8) month 
      period effective immediately; 
   -  The Registrar impose the following term, condition and limitation on Dr. Virani’s 
      certificate of registration, to be removed once the College receives proof of completion of 
      the course: 
         a. Dr. Virani shall successfully complete the next available course in Ethics that is 
            approved by the College, at his own expense. 
   -  Dr. Virani shall appear before the Committee to be reprimanded within three (3) months 
      of the date this Order becomes final; 
   -  Dr. Virani to pay costs to the College for a one-day hearing in the amount of $5,000.00 
      within 30 days of the date of this Order. 
       
APPEAL 
 
On September 27, 2016, Dr. Virani appealed the September 21, 2016 decision of the Discipline 
Committee to the Divisional Court of the Superior Court of Justice. 
 
On July 27, 2017, the Divisional Court dismissed the appeal. Therefore, the decision of the 
Discipline Committee remains in effect.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): June 20-21, 2016


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 03 Sep 1987
Summary:

 In September 1987, Dr. Virani pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in 
 s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of 
 practice of the profession.  The Discipline Committee accepted this plea and found Dr. Virani 
 guilty of professional misconduct.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Virani be 
 reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.  The Committee further 
 ruled that a restriction be placed on Dr. Virani's licence such that he be prohibited from 
 practicing anaesthesia until and unless he satisfied the Registrar that he had updated his 
 expertise in that specialty.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 03 Sep 1987