Virdy, Kiran (CPSO#: 70405)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
M C I The Doctors Office
Mississauga west
2575 Dundas St. W
Unite #15
Mississauga ON  L5L 3P9
Phone: (905) 820-3310
Fax: (905) 820-3312
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

MCI/Doctor's Office
Bramalea City Centre
25 Peel Centre Dr, Unit 387
Brampton, Ontario
Brampton ON  L6T 3R5
Canada
Phone: (905) 793-7077
Fax: (905) 793-7506
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIRAN VIRDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIRDY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1998