Virey, Maselle Gaerlan (CPSO#: 52301)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jan 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jan 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino, Tagalog

Education:University of the Philippines, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
71 King Street West
Suite 300
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A2
Phone: (905) 896-1302
Fax: (905) 896-8223
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Adult Mental Health Services
Trillium Health Partners
2085 Hurontario Street, Suite 300
Mississauga ON  L5A4G1
Canada
Phone: 905 848 7586
Fax: 905 848 7357
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maselle G. Virey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Virey ( CPSO# 52301 )

Business Address:
Suite 300
71 King Street West
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A2
Phone Number: (905) 896-1302

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 26 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MASELLE GAERLAN VIREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIREY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1987