Visbal Moreno, Antonio Luis (CPSO#: 81624)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad De Cartagena, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 313
145 Government Road East
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 3P4
Phone: (705) 568-2131
Fax: (705) 568-2133
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Antonio Visbal Moreno Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Visbal Moreno ( CPSO# 81624 )

Business Address:
313 - 145 Government Road East
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 3P4
Phone Number: (705) 568-2131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jul 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTONIO LUIS VISBAL MORENO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VISBAL MORENO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 17 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 18 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
International Specialist Physician - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 May 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 02 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2009