Visram, Farzin Mohamed (CPSO#: 69253)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Kachchi

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre
Juravinski Site
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Farzin M. Visram Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Visram ( CPSO# 69253 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre
Juravinski Site
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 28 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FARZIN MOHAMED VISRAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VISRAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1999