Visser, Karen Ann Lee (CPSO#: 80759)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 110
152 Cleopatra Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 5X2
Phone: (613) 725-1870 Ext. 4
Fax: (613) 725-1647
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

560-1145 Hunt Club Road
Ottawa ON  K1V 0Y3
Canada
Phone: (613)738-2379
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 14570
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN ANN LEE VISSER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VISSER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2010