Vitou, Louise Yolande (CPSO#: 60012)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
475 Park Street
Suite 302A
Kitchener ON  N2G 4V5
Phone: (519) 743-9309
Fax: (519) 743-9726
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Louise Vitou Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Vitou ( CPSO# 60012 )

Business Address:
475 Park Street
Suite 302A
Kitchener ON  N2G 4V5
Phone Number: (519) 743-9309

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 06 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOUISE YOLANDE VITOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VITOU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1989