Vivas, Lilian Lee Yan (CPSO#: 100651)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: Wong, Lilian Lee Yan (used until: 22 Jul 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
Division of Physiatry
550 University Avenue 10th Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Ext. 3834
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vivas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Vivas ( CPSO# 98037 )
Dr. L. Vivas ( CPSO# 100651)

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
Division of General Internal Medicine
Room N2 880
2100 Boviard Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7

Business Address:
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
Division of Physiatry
10th Floor
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LILIAN LEE YAN VIVAS shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. VIVAS is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. VIVAS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. VIVAS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. VIVAS shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. VIVAS is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. VIVAS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 11 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 12 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 11 Mar 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 12 Mar 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018