Vivian, Anthony Charles Harvey (CPSO#: 30426)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of London, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
205 - 45625 Hodgins Avenue
Chilliwack BC  V2P 1P2
Phone: (604) 792-5540
Fax: (604) 792-9284
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

28 3800 golf course drive
abbotsford BC  V3G0A7
Canada
Phone: (604) 614-3491
Fax: 6047929284
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY CHARLES HARVEY VIVIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIVIAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Sep 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Oct 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1987