Viviani, Guillermo Richard (CPSO#: 25970)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Catholic University of Chile, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 02 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2006