Vivona, Angelo Antonio (CPSO#: 68190)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
377 Church St
Suite 402
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone: (905) 472-7122
Fax: (905) 472-2290
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Angelo A. Vivona Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Vivona ( CPSO# 68190 )

Business Address:
377 Church Street
Suite 402
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 472-7122

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELO ANTONIO VIVONA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIVONA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999