Vizel, Saul (CPSO#: 57439)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Dec 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1
715 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7R1
Phone: (519) 622-0067
Fax: (519) 622-6146
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saul Vizel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Vizel ( CPSO# 57439 )

Business Address:
1 - 715 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7R1
Phone Number: (519) 622-0067

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 29 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAUL VIZEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIZEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 1987