Vlachos, Helen (CPSO#: 70297)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 02 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Greek

Education:McGill University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 24 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 02 Feb 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1996
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002