Vlahaki, Dean Matthew (CPSO#: 97636)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Emergency Medicine
McMaster Clinic, 2nd Floor
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dean Vlahaki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Vlahaki ( CPSO# 97636 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Emergency Medicine
McMaster Clinic, 2nd Floor
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEAN MATTHEW VLAHAKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VLAHAKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017