Vlahos, Donna Soultana (CPSO#: 62482)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough General Medical Mall
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 205
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 439-7968
Fax: (416) 439-3088
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONNA SOULTANA VLAHOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VLAHOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1991