Vlaovic, Peter David (CPSO#: 73908)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Sep 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English, Serbian

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital
Suite 305 K Wing
650 Sammon Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5M5
Phone: (416) 465-6008
Fax: (416) 465-3901
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010


Corporation Name: Peter Vlaovic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Vlaovic ( CPSO# 73908 )

Business Address:
Suite 305
650 Sammon Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5M5
Phone Number: (416) 465-6008

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 31 Dec 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER DAVID VLAOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VLAOVIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2006